California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:25-cv-04171
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 10:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Coinbase Global, Inc.
Defendant
Coinbase, Inc.
100 Pine Street Suite 1250
San Francisco, CA 94111
Plaintiff
G. B.
Represented By
M. Anderson Berry
Clayeo C. Arnold, A Professional Law Corp.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 05/15 11:33 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 05/15 11:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 05/15 10:58 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/29/2025. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Thu 05/15 10:35 AM
Proposed Summons. (Berry, M.)
Related: [-]
3 3 26 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/15 10:34 AM
COMPLAINT Related [+] against Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc. with jury demand. Filed by Gerard Belian.(Berry, M.) Modified on 5/15/2025 (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] ceipt ACANDA-20680730
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 05/15 9:41 AM
***DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET # 4 FOR CORRECT FILING.*** Proposed Summons. (Berry, M.) Modified on 5/15/2025 (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/15 9:39 AM
***DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET # 3 FOR CORRECT FILING.*** COMPLAINT against Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc.. Filed by G. B..(Berry, M.) Modified on 5/15/2025 (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 05/15 10:08 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . A motion and proposed order to proceed using a pseudonym must be filed before the case will be assigned. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office until such motion and proposed order is received. Additionally, the proposed summons will not be issued until the pseudonym motion is granted. Re:1 Complaint filed by G. B. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]