Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Matthew W Mcfarland
Case #: 1:25-cv-00318
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 2:10 PM EDT
Defendant
LJ Traffic Control, LLC
Plaintiff
Shiniqua Washington


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/22 4:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to LJ Traffic Control, LLC on 5/22/2025, answer due 7/21/2025. (Filippelli, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 05/16 1:08 PM
Summons Issued as to LJ Traffic Control, LLC. (eh)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 05/16 1:05 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/15 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against LJ Traffic Control, LLC. (Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10511173), filed by Shiniqua Washington. (Filippelli, Paul) Modified docket text on 5/15/2025 (jmt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form