Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Robert D Mariani
Referred: Ca
Case #: 3:25-cv-00859
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:May 15, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
utility ADI Receipt Entry Fri 05/16 1:02 PM
Receipt of payment from DPAM325CV000859 in the amount of $5.00 for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Transaction posted on 5/15/2025. Receipt number 333114973 processed by AO. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
5 5 4 pgs order Order Thu 05/15 3:40 PM
ORDER with Notice of Election re:1 it is hereby ORDERED that:1.Petitioner is granted leave to withdraw the current § 2254 petition without prejudice to file another § 2254 petition raising all grounds for relief from his conviction.2.Petitioner is granted thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to notify the Court of his decision. If he fails to do so, the Court will rule on the current § 2254 petition as filed.3.If the limitations period would expire during this thirty 30-day period, the limitations period is tolled from the date of this Order until Petitioners notification is filed, or until thirty (30) days have elapsed, whichever is earliest. In these circumstances, and if Petitioner decides to file an all-inclusive § 2254 petition raising all grounds for relief, Petitioners response must also be accompanied by his new § 2254 petition. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 5/15/2025. (cac)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Pro Se Letter Issued - DJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Thu 05/15 11:49 AM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent
3 3 misc Document Filed Thu 05/15 11:44 AM
Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stanley Lee Mosley. Petitioner paid filing fee. (lp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Document Filed Thu 05/15 11:42 AM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition by Stanley Lee Mosley..(lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Criminal Docket No. CP-21-CR-0002452-2015 from Court of Common Pleas of Cumberland County,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Court of Common Pleas of Cumberland County Court Order dated 05/19/2020,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Court of Common Pleas Cumberland County Court Order dated 01/06/2021,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Missing Mail receipt,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Proof of Service with correspondence to petitioner from Marlin L. Markley, Jr., Esquire,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Court of Common Pleas Cumberland County Court Order dated 10/13/2022 with Correspondence from counsel to petitioner,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Transmission Verification Report with request for updates,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Copy of IN Re: 404(b) Motion, Pretrial Hearing and Jury Trial List of Exhibits
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 05/15 11:28 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number 333114973), filed by Stanley Lee Mosley.(lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Filing Fee Receipt