California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Referred: Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:25-cv-04188
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 15, 2025
Case in other court:Santa Clara County Superior Court, 24CV453465
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 2:08 PM PDT
Defendant
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By
Trina Marie Clayton
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSHUA BRADSHAW


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
10 10 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/16 6:36 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/16 11:49 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 05/16 11:05 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 05/16 10:49 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FORD MOTOR COMPANY..(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Fri 05/16 11:49 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for Discovery. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 05/16 6:23 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .Counsel is reminded not to add parties in all caps. For future reference, please refer to https://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. See Guide to E-Filing New Civil Cases (Section III.c Adding Parties). Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
6 6 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 05/15 2:56 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/29/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 05/15 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Hugret, Spencer)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 05/15 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Katherine Pollard Vilchez on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Vilchez, Katherine)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 05/15 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Trina Marie Clayton on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 05/15 2:05 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by FORD MOTOR COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plan), Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the Ford defined contribution plan) for FORD MOTOR COMPANY.(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 05/15 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV453465. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20682995). Filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.(Clayton, Trina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Atty iso Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 12 Certificate/Proof of Service