California Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:25-cv-04193
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 5:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Vistra Corporation
Plaintiff
David Hyland
Represented By
J. David Nick
Law Office Of J. David Nick
contact info
Plaintiff
Stackview Farms


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/16 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Russell Loren Goodrow on behalf of Stack View Farms Inc., David Hyland (Goodrow, Russell)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/16 9:32 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 05/16 8:11 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 05/16 9:28 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The summons should be uploaded separately and not as part of, or as an attachment to, the complaint or other initiating documents. This filing will not be processed by the Clerk's Office. Please re-file the summons in its entirety, using event: Proposed Summons***. Re:1 Complaint,, filed by Stack View Farms Inc., David Hyland (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/15 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20684369.). Filed by David Hyland.(Nick, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons