Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:25-cv-00924
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 15, 2025
Case in other court:Snohomish County Superior Court, 25-00002-02714-31
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 5:08 PM PDT
Defendant
NASW RRG Insurance Company n/k/a Preferra Insurance Company Risk Retention Group
Represented By
Eliot M Harris
Williams Kastner (sea)
contact info
Jennifer E Aragon
Williams, Kastner & Gibbs Pllc (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Diandra Uttech
Plaintiff
Logan Uttech
Represented By
Ryan T Pittman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
David P Moody
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Martin D McLean
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
7 7 order RAJ Joint Status Report Order (FORM) Thu 05/22 3:06 PM
ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/5/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/12/2025, Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2025. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc RAJ Standing Order (FORM) Thu 05/22 3:05 PM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 05/22 2:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. (TF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
4 4 misc Consent Letter & Form Tue 05/20 1:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 5/27/2025. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Tue 05/20 1:06 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Redaction. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MIH)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Tue 05/20 1:03 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 05/20 1:01 PM
Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Tue 05/20 1:02 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant NASW RRG Insurance Company n/k/a Preferra Insurance Company Risk Retention Group must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/27/2025. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MIH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 05/15 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 25 2-02714 31; Related [+] Attorney Jennifer E Aragon added to party NASW RRG Insurance Company n/k/a Preferra Insurance Company Risk Retention Group(pty:dft) filed by NASW RRG Insurance Company n/k/a Preferra Insurance Company Risk Retention Group.(Aragon, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8981346
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Complaint 2025-03-24,
Att: 3 Exhibit B 3.24.2025 Case Info Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit C Summons to NASW,
Att: 5 Exhibit D First Amended Complaint 4.17.25,
Att: 6 Exhibit E 4.25.2025 Decl Service of 1st Amended Compl & Summons,
Att: 7 Exhibit F 4.30.2025 NOA for EMH,
Att: 8 Exhibit G 5.1.2025 Proposed Order re Stipulated Mnt Amend Caption,
Att: 9 Exhibit H 5.1.2025 Stipulated MO Amend Caption,
Att: 10 Exhibit I 5.2.2025 ORDER Granting Stip MO to Amend Caption,
Att: 11 Exhibit J 5.2.2025 First Amended Complaint,
Att: 12 Exhibit K Docket #25 2-02714 31 Snohomish County