Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Judith E Levy
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 5:25-cv-10302
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 11:03 PM EDT
Defendant
Laureate International Universities
Represented By
Ronald L. Cornell, Jr.
Sk Detroit Law Partners, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Walden University, LLC
515 East Park Avenue, 2nd FL
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Ronald L. Cornell, Jr.
Sk Detroit Law Partners, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Martin
Represented By
Jerard M. Scanland
Mussin And Scanland, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
order Text-Only Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/16 9:08 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting9 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 6/20/2025, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
10 10 order Reassignment/Disqualification Thu 05/15 2:14 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg in Detroit to District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
9 9 STIPULATION re1 Complaint,, to extend time for Defendants to respond to Complaint by All Defendants (Cornell, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald L. Cornell, Jr appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Cornell, Ronald)
Related: [-]
7 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Martin (Scanland, Jerard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting3 Motion to Extend Service to 7/1/2025. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SPin)
Related: [-]
5 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Martin Laureate University (Scanland, Jerard) Modified on 4/30/2025 (SSch). [SUMMONS EXECUTED ON LSC LAWYERS ON 4/30/2025]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Martin (Scanland, Jerard) Modified on 4/30/2025 (SSch). [SERVICE EXECUTED AS TO LAUREATE INTERNATIONAL UNIVERSITIES ON 4/29/25]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION TO EXTEND Summons by Mary Martin. (Scanland, Jerard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit Of Non-Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit Email From Nicole Whitecar,
Att: 3 Exhibit Order
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
2 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Laureate International Universities, Walden University, LLC* (THum)
Related: [-]
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (THum)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mary Martin against Walden University, LLC and Laureate International Universities D/B/A Laureate Education, INC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10101661 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Scanland, Jerard)
Related: [-]