Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Julie S Sneed
Referred: Philip R Lammens
Case #: 5:25-cv-00309
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Lake County Clerk of Court
Defendant
Lake County Government
Defendant
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
Defendant
Norman C. Polak
Plaintiff
Mohamed Nguida
433 Donnelly Street
Eustis, FL 32726


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
4 4 16 pgs order Order Fri 05/16 10:01 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 5/16/2025. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
3 3 order Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants Thu 05/15 3:33 PM
NOTICE to pro se litigant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/15/2025. (MGB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/15 3:26 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mohamed Nguida. (MGB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/15 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Lake County Clerk of Court, Lake County Government, Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP, Norman C. Polak titled, "Second Amended Complaint" filed by Mohamed Nguida. (No service copies provided)(MGB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits