Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Case #: 1:25-cv-02654
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC Corp 1-3
Defendant
John Does 1-3
Defendant
QuikTrip Corporation
Represented By
Alexia Woodley
Cruser, Mitchell, Novitz, Sanchez, Gaston & Zimet, LLP
contact info
Candice Renee Bryant
Cruser, Mitchell, Novitz, Sanchez, Gaston & Zimet, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcelyn B. Lundie-Reid
Represented By
Alice Hollaway
Kaine Law
contact info
Evan L. Kaine
Kaine Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
4 4 misc Letter re:83.1 Thu 05/15 10:24 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Alexia Woodley. Clerk to follow-up by 5/27/2025. (esr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/15 8:48 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by QuikTrip Corporation. (dgr)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 05/15 8:46 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by QuikTrip Corporation. Discovery ends on 10/10/2025.(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Answer Filed in State Court
1 1 7 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Thu 05/15 8:45 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-14292345)(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Filings with Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet