California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Carolyn K Delaney
Case #: 2:25-cv-01382
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 14, 2025
Case in other court:San Joaquin County Superior Court, STK-CV-UBC-25-0004263
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
FPI Management
Defendant
I.Q. Data International, Inc.
Represented By
Kendra S. Canape
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Defendant
Patmon Company, Inc.
Defendant
Stonebrier Apartments
Plaintiff
Kevin Starks
P.O. Box 93
Jamestown, CA 95327


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss Wed 05/21 4:33 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by FPI Management, Patmon Company, Inc., Stonebrier Apartments. Attorney Eldred, Jason Gregory added. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.(Eldred, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jason G. Eldred in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Approving Motion to Dismiss
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/21 4:01 PM
MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER Responsive Pleading by I.Q. Data International, Inc..(Canape, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant IQ Data International, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint
Thursday, May 15, 2025
4 4 misc Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order (Civil) for TLN Thu 05/15 11:23 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Deputy Clerk OML)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
service Service by Mail Thu 05/15 11:23 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order served on Kevin Starks. (Deputy Clerk OML)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
3 3 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by I.Q. Data International, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, (Canape, Kendra)
Related: [-]
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant I.Q. Data International, Inc.. (Canape, Kendra)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UBC-2025-0004263 by I.Q. Data International, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12220207)(Canape, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet