Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00463
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 1:49 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mario Toribio-Pacheco (1)
Terminated: 04/24/2025
Represented By
Nicholas Robert Bischoff
Law Offices Of Nicholas R Bischoff
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 5:50 AM MST
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
Arrest of Mario Toribio-Pacheco on 4/15/2025. (SIB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Mario Toribio-Pacheco. (SIB)
Related: [-]