California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01826
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 2:09 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Gray Blu Cellular Phone 2025250600030601-0004 ("Target Device") (1)
Terminated: 04/16/2025


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 6:24 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to Gray Blu Cellular Phone 2025250600030601-0004 ("Target Device"). (cxl)
Related: [-]