Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00372
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Terminated:May 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 2:47 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Courtney L. Coker-DOJ
U.S. Attorneys Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Luis Robert Velazquez (1)
Terminated: 05/14/2025
Represented By
Phillip A Linder
Barrett Bright Lassiter Linder
contact info
Suzy Vanegas
Law Office Of Suzy Vanegas
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 5:38 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Luis Robert Velazquez (1). (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd)
Related: [-]