California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:25-cv-04127
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
County of Alameda
Defendant
Doe Custodial Staff 1-50
Plaintiff
I.P.C.
Represented By
Zachary Linowitz
Linowitz Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 05/16 9:57 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by I.P.C... (Linowitz, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 05/15 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to County of Alameda. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 05/15 10:42 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/15 9:56 AM
Case Reassigned due to Attorney Error in Case Opening. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 ERRATA Regarding Nature of Suit and Divisional Assignment by I.P.C.. (Linowitz, Zachary)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Linowitz, Zachary)
Related: [-]
2 2 Filed in Error per Attorney. Nature of Suit remains 550. Civil Cover Sheet by I.P.C. a minor, through her mother and next friend Christina Pallas . (Linowitz, Zachary) Modified on 5/14/2025 (mbc, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT I.P.C., a minor, through her mother and next friend Christina Pallas against County of Alameda ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20673121.). Filed by I.P.C..(Linowitz, Zachary) Modified on 5/15/2025 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits