Marquardt v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Alex G Tse |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-04203 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 2:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darin Marquardt
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
9 | 9
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC..(Lambert, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC..(Hugret, Spencer) Modified on 5/16/2025 (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 05/16 9:17 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
misc
New Case Filing Fee
Fri 05/16 9:06 AM
FEE PAID (Filing fee$405,receipt number ACANDC-20685504). (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Non-Payment
Fri 05/16 8:21 AM
NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (smc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Thu 05/15 11:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, Other Affiliate Jaguar Land Rover Limited, Other Affiliate Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC, Other Affiliate Tata Motors Ltd., Other Affiliate TML Holdings Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate Jaguar Land Rover Holdings Limited, for Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. re1 Notice of Removal,(Lambert, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Thu 05/15 10:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Lambert, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Answer to Removal Complaint by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/16/2025 (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |