Washington Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00062
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 2:38 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Amanda Gibson (1)
Terminated: 04/16/2025


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 7:11 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 ORDER GRANTING TRANSFER OF PROBATION JURISDICTION as to Amanda Gibson signed by Judge Tana Lin. Probation Jurisdiction is transferred from Western District of Missouri, Kansas City - Case # 4:18-CR-00129-DGK-13. (cc: USPO, Fin., Missouri Western) (RE)
Related: [-]
2 2 Probation Documents Transferred from Western District of Missouri, Kansas City as to defendant Amanda Gibson. Copies of Information, Indictment, Plea Agreement, Judgment received. (RE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Indictment,
Att: 2 Plea Agreement,
Att: 3 Judgment,
Att: 4 Docket Report