Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:25-cv-00878
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 2:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Arete Law Group
Plaintiff
Roosevelt Truvillion
706 UNION STREET APT 602
SEATTLE, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date Fri 05/16 11:09 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause by 6/3/2025, why the Court should not recommend his IFP application be denied. In the alternative, Plaintiff may file an amended IFP application clarifying the matters noted above by that date. The Clerk is directed to renote Plaintiff's IFP application (dkt. #1 ) for 6/3/2025, and to send copies of this order to Plaintiff, along with a blank IFP application, and to the Honorable Richard A. Jones. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (APH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
3 3 misc Letter Thu 05/15 1:59 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (RE)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
1 1 motion Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/15 1:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson filed by Roosevelt Truvillion. (RE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet