Original Case: 9:24-cv-80690

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-prici-11632
Typeprivate civil / diversity
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 4:40 AM EDT
Petitioner - Appellee
SHANGHAI LIYU OPTOELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
Represented By
Steven L. Sugars
Law Offices of Steven L. Sugars
contact info
Xuesong Alex Yu
Alex Yu, PA
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
BRITE LITE TRIBE, LLC
Represented By
Kristin Drecktrah Paz
Pierson Ferdinand, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 4:40 AM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Brite Lite Tribe, LLC on 05/08/2025. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/02/2025 as to Appellant Brite Lite Tribe, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/12/2025 as to Appellee Shanghai Liyu Optoelectronics Co., Ltd..
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 14 pgs DC Order Dismissing/Closing Case doc#43
Att: 3 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing