Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:R Austin Huffaker, Jr
Referred: Charles S Coody
Case #: 2:25-cv-00376
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 15, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/16 2:58 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that by May 30, 2025, Plf must file a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk showing the average monthly balance and average monthly deposits in his prison account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this Complaint; the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plf is detained, as further set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/16/2025. (copy mailed to AC at Montgomery Co. Det. Facility) (BES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
2 2 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit Fri 05/16 10:20 AM
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Sylvester Williams. (RLD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Inmate 1983 Complaint Fri 05/16 10:19 AM
Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Sylvester Williams, C/O Bramo, Mario Caphton, Charlie Jackson, Zadarian Mills, filed by Sylvester Williams.(RLD)
Related: [-]