Blakeley v. Perez et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jonathan E Hawley |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-01193 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Remark: Blank IFP Form. (VH) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust fund ledger sheets due by 5/30/2025. (KE) |
|
order
Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 05/16 12:02 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by District Judge Jonathan E Hawley on 5/16/2025. On 5/15/2025, Plaintiff filed an incomplete Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis3 . His Petition is not signed, and the second page is missing. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 states, "[e]very pleading, written motion, and other paper must be signed... by a party personally if the party is unrepresented." Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a). The Clerk is directed to STRIKE Plaintiff's Petition3 . To proceed with this action, Plaintiff must file a signed and complete Petition or pay the $405 filing fee in full within 21 days of this Order. The failure to pay the filing fee in full or to file a signed and complete Petition on or before June 6, 2025, will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. (VH) |
||
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Intreal Blakeley. Responses due by 5/29/2025 (KE) |
|
3 | 3
![]() STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED ON 5/16/2025 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Intreal Blakeley.(KE) Modified on 5/16/2025 (VH) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Jonathan E Hawley. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 6/4/2025.(KE) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Intreal Blakeley.(KE) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |