California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:25-cv-04210
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 16, 2025
Case in other court:San Francisco County Superior Court, CGC-25-624069
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 11:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Weston &n Agness LLC Aaron C. Agness Shadie Maghareh 1960 E. Grand Avenue, Ste. 400
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Aaron Chapman Agness
Weston & Agness LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sunquest Properties, Inc.
HGI Law Group John M. Haushalter 470 E. 19th Street
Upland, CA 91784
Plaintiff
Universal Paragon Corporation
HGI Law Group John M. Haushalter, Esq 470 E. 19th Street
Upland, CA 91784


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/16 6:47 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2025 at 1:30 PM in Oakland - Videoconference Only. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 05/16 10:25 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/16 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-25-6244069, (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number ACANDC-20685368). Filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Agness, Aaron) Modified on 5/16/2025 (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Maghareh ISO Removal,
Att: 3 Certificate of Interested Parties,
Att: 4 Notice of Related Case