California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:25-cv-04227
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 12:07 PM PDT
Defendant
County of Marin
Defendant
Juliet De La Cruz
Defendant
Brian Johnson
Defendant
Jorge Yauger
Defendant
Dustin Yeager
Plaintiff
Janet Leeds
Represented By
Dale Kristopher Galipo
Law Offices Of Dale K. Galipo
contact info
Marcel Ferrar Sincich
The Law Offices Of Dale K. Galipo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 05/16 2:26 PM
Summons Issued as to County of Marin. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/16 2:22 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 05/16 11:56 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 05/16 11:15 AM
Proposed Summons. (Sincich, Marcel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/16 11:10 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20686513.). Filed by Janet Leeds. (Galipo, Dale)
Related: [-]