Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Jennifer P Wilson
Case #: 1:25-cv-00871
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 16, 2025
Case in other court:New Jersey, 2:24-cv-09720
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 5:14 PM EDT
Defendant
ABC Corporation #1-10
Defendant
Abc Maintenance 1-10
Defendant
JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10 (being fictitious persons whose identities are currently unknown)
Defendant
Jacob Ladd
Represented By
Kamela Devole
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Lauren Vicencio
Wshb, LLP
contact info
Michael Dolich
Bennett, Bricklin & Saltzberg
contact info
Defendant
Xyz Management 1-10
Plaintiff
Devin Capeles
Represented By
Damon A. Vespi
Vespi Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Ethan Capeles
Represented By
Damon A. Vespi
Vespi Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Capeles
Represented By
Damon A. Vespi
Vespi Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Lydia Capeles
Represented By
Damon A. Vespi
Vespi Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathaniel Capeles
Represented By
Damon A. Vespi
Vespi Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Airbnb
Terminated: 02/10/2025
Defendant
BNBS R Us
Terminated: 03/28/2025
Represented By
Kamela Devole
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
23 23 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 05/16 2:38 PM
Case transferred electronically in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:24-cv-09720 containing electronic documents.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
22 22 ORDER transferring this matter to the United States District Court of the Middle District of Pennsylvania; closing this case. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 5/14/2025. (mxw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
21 21 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue by JACOB LADD.(DEVOLE, KAMELA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhbit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D
Friday, March 28, 2025
19 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT BNBS R US, ONLY. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/28/2025. (ld) Modified on 4/1/2025 (jdg). [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
18 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BNBS R US, JACOB LADD. (DEVOLE, KAMELA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
20 20 TEXT ORDER: Ladd has waived service objection. Parties will stipulate BNBS out of case without prejudice. Parties will submit a scheduling order. The Court will hold a teleconference on 5/21/25 at 1 p.m. using the Webex platform. Parties are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/26/2025. (qa, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
17 17 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the letter from Defense counsel, (ECF No.16 ). The Court will hold a teleconference to discuss on 3/26/25 at 11:30 a.m. Parties are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed. Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants must appear. The Court will address issues related to service and the timeline for responsive pleadings during the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/18/2025. (qa, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
16 16 Letter from Defendants Jacob Lapp (incorrectly designated as Jacob Ladd) and BNBS R US, LLC (incorrectly designated as BNBS R US). (DEVOLE, KAMELA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE of Appearance by KAMELA DEVOLE on behalf of BNBS R US(DEVOLE, KAMELA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
14 14 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to JACOB LAPP (IMPROPERLY PLED AS JACOB LADD).. (DOLICH, MICHAEL) (Main Document 14 replaced on 3/18/2025) (sm, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
13 13 TEXT ORDER: Our records indicate that proof of service has been filed as to defendant, BNBS R US, in this civil action and that the time for defendant to answer has expired. You are hereby directed to move this civil action by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to Answer out of time within fourteen (14) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on March 31, 2025, at 9:00 am. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 03/17/2025. (lr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
12 12 Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m) as to defendant, Jacob Ladd. Motion set for 3/31/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (lr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
11 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER of voluntary dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant AIRBNB. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 2/10/2025. (mxw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
10 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant AIRBNB, ONLY by NATHANIEL CAPELES, JACQUELINE CAPELES, ETHAN CAPELES, DEVIN CAPELES, LYDIA CAPELES. (VESPI, DAMON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
9 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ETHAN CAPELES, JACQUELINE CAPELES, NATHANIEL CAPELES, DEVIN CAPELES, LYDIA CAPELES. BNBS R US served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025. (VESPI, DAMON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
8 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL DOLICH on behalf of JACOB LADD (DOLICH, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
7 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATION 1-10, ABC MAINTENANCE 1-10, AIRBNB, BNBS R US, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10 (being fictitious persons whose identities are currently unknown), JACOB LADD, XYZ MANAGEMENT 1-10, filed by ETHAN CAPELES, JACQUELINE CAPELES, NATHANIEL CAPELES, DEVIN CAPELES, LYDIA CAPELES.(VESPI, DAMON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
6 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of and has reviewed the1 complaint. Plaintiff fails to sufficiently identify the citizenship of the parties for purposes of diversity jurisdiction. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall, by November 21, 2024, file an amended complaint sufficiently setting forth the basis for this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/07/2024. (lr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN VICENCIO on behalf of JACOB LADD(VICENCIO, LAUREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JACOB LADD.(DEVOLE, KAMELA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KAMELA DEVOLE on behalf of JACOB LADD(DEVOLE, KAMELA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certification of Service
2 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AIRBNB, BNBS R US, JACOB LADD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15733092) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ETHAN CAPELES, JACQUELINE CAPELES, DEVIN CAPELES, NATHANIEL CAPELES, LYDIA CAPELES.(VESPI, DAMON) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/16/2025.]
Related: [-]