California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:25-cv-04243
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 16, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 5:02 PM PDT
Defendant
Coinbase Global, Inc.
Defendant
Coinbase, Inc.
430 California Street
San Francisco, CA 94104
Plaintiff
Keefe John
Represented By
Matthew John Langley
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Neu
Represented By
Matthew John Langley
Almeida Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 05/19 12:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Coinbase, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 05/19 12:18 PM
Summons Issued as to Coinbase Global, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 05/19 11:19 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 05/16 3:50 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 05/16 3:24 PM
Proposed Summons. (Langley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 05/16 3:23 PM
Proposed Summons. (Langley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/16 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Coinbase Global, Inc., Coinbase, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20688489.). Filed by Benjamin Neu, Keefe John. (Langley, Matthew)
Related: [-]