California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:25-cv-04249
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:May 16, 2025
Case in other court:California Superior Court, County of Contra Costa, C25-00987
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 5:03 PM PDT
Defendant
FreshRealm, Inc.
3301 N. Dallas Avenue
Lancaster, TX 75134
Represented By
Melissa Eubanks
Vgc, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rhonda Casanares


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 05/19 8:58 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 05/19 8:38 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 17, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Sat 05/17 4:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Diyari Vazquez on behalf of FreshRealm, Inc. (Vazquez, Diyari)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/16 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Melissa Eubanks on behalf of FreshRealm, Inc. (Eubanks, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/16 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa. Their case number is C25-00987. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20688916). Filed by FreshRealm, Inc..(Eubanks, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Declaration Declaration of Gina Farschman,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Interested Parties,
Att: 11 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Mon 05/19 8:56 PM
Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No.1 -7) by FreshRealm, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]