Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:25-cv-02718
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 1:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Douglas County Sheriff's Office
Defendant
Thomas Samples
Plaintiff
Aaliyah Adams
Represented By
Benjamin Lloyd Crump
Ben Crump Law, PLLC
contact info
Mario Anthony Pacella
Strom Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Bakari T. Sellers
Strom Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
7 7 30+ pgs order Order Fri 05/16 1:49 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 5/16/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/16 10:31 AM
NOTICE by Aaliyah Adams Change of Address (Pacella, Mario)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 05/16 9:52 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Bakari T. Sellers. Clerk to follow-up by 5/27/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 05/16 9:50 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Benjamin Lloyd Crump. Clerk to follow-up by 5/27/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 05/16 9:30 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Douglas County Sheriff's Office, Thomas Samples.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/16 9:28 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aaliyah Adams. (ajw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/16 9:26 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14301400) filed by Aaliyah Adams.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet