Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Case #: 2:25-cv-02482
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 4:12 AM EDT
Defendant
CDHA MANAGEMENT, LLC
Defendant
SPARK DSO, LLC
Plaintiff
KARICIA CALLUM
Represented By
BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Shub Johns & Holbrook LLP
contact info
KENNETH J. GRUNFELD
Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert
contact info
Plaintiff
S.J.
Represented By
BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Shub Johns & Holbrook LLP
contact info
KENNETH J. GRUNFELD
Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 05/19 10:35 AM
Summons Issued as to CDHA MANAGEMENT, LLC, SPARK DSO, LLC. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 5/19/25 (va)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 05/16 6:16 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by KARICIA CALLUM, S.J..Certificate of Service, Memorandum.(JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum ISO Plaintiffs' Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Shub Johns & Holbrook Resume,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Milberg Resume,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Golomb Legal Resume,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Fri 05/16 3:35 PM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
Thursday, May 15, 2025
1 1 24 pgs COMPLAINT for Class Action against CDHA MANAGEMENT, LLC, SPARK DSO, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18297279.), filed by KARICIA CALLUM, S.J., by and through her parent and guardian.(GRUNFELD, KENNETH) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/16/2025) (sbt).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Notice Letter,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form