Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Aida M Delgado-Colon
Case #: 3:25-cv-01264
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 1:03 AM AST
Defendant
Goya de Puerto Rico
Plaintiff
Rafael A. Torres-Nieves
39-26 Calle 35
Bayamon, PR 00961


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM AST
Friday, May 16, 2025
5 5 misc Notice to Pro Se Litigant Fri 05/16 5:24 PM
NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Complaint. A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Copy of this notice, Standing Order No. 10 - Consent by Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing in Civil Cases and Consent Form sent to Pro Se by mail.) (idg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 misc Financial Affidavit Fri 05/16 5:23 PM
**SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT in Support of3 Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel by Rafael A. Torres-Nieves, pro se. (idg)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 05/16 5:21 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Rafael A. Torres-Nieves, pro se. Responses due by 5/27/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (idg)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 05/16 5:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Goya de Puerto Rico, filed by Rafael A. Torres-Nieves, pro se. Service due by 8/11/2025,(idg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/16 5:18 PM
**CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rafael A. Torres-Nieves, pro se. Responses due by 5/27/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (idg)
Related: [-]