California Northern District Court
Judge:Richard Seeborg
Referred: Pslc Mwd
Case #: 3:24-cv-07273
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
17 17 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/16 11:41 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. District Judge Noel Wise no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
16 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ames. Service waived by Ames waiver sent on 4/11/2025, answer due 6/10/2025.(krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter from County Counsel,
Att: 2 Envelope
15 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ruiz. Service waived by Ruiz waiver sent on 4/11/2025, answer due 6/10/2025.(krp, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/15/2025 (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter from County Counsel,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, May 12, 2025
14 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to District Judge Noel Wise. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
12 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ames, Ruiz.. (Hurley, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Deputy Ruiz at the West County Detention Facility of Contra Costa County on 04/11/2025. Waiver of Service due by 5/12/2025.(krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and Consent Form
10 10 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Deputy Ames at the West County Detention Facility of Contra Costa County on 04/11/2025. Waiver of Service due by 5/12/2025.(krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and Consent Form
Copies of9 Order of Service and7 Amended Complaint mailed to County Counsel for Contra Costa County (1025 Escobar St., 3rd Fl., Martinez, CA 94553) per9 Order. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
9 9 ORDER OF SERVICE; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion; Instructions to Clerk. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 4/10/2025. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
8 8 Letter from Christopher Davon Scott dated February 26, 2025.(krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ames, Ruiz, Contra Costa Sheriff Department. Filed by Christopher Davon Scott. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
6 6 ORDER GRANTING Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/11/2025. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Docket No. 2). Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Davon Scott.(krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, October 17, 2024
3 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (dhm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Davon Scott.(dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 COMPLAINT against Ames, Ruiz. (No process, IFP pending) Filed by Christopher Davon Scott. Consent/Declination due by 11/18/2024.(dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope