California Central District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00299
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 12:14 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Francisco Gamez (1)
Terminated: 04/18/2025
Represented By
Federal Public Defender
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 12:43 AM PDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 ORDER TRANSFERRING JURISDICTION filed by Judge Philip P. Simon as to Supervised Releasee Francisco Gamez. Case transferred in from the Northern District of Indiana. Approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (lom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CR-25
2 2 NOTICE OF JURISDICTION/TREATY TRANSFER-IN: The Court has approved the supervised release transfer-in as to Supervised Releasee Francisco Gamez. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. Re Probation/Supervised Release Jurisdiction Transfer-In (PO-22)1 . (lom)
Related: [-]