Maryland District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-01082
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Terminated:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 3:15 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
SAUSA Fort Meade
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Nawel F Raujah (1)
Terminated: 05/15/2025
7712 Touchstone Way
Elkridge, MD 21075
Represented By
Gerald C Ruter
Law Offices Of Gerald C. Ruter, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 3:44 AM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 Citation Issued as to Nawel F Raujah (1) count(s) 1.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Ticket,
Att: 2 Additional Probable Cause
2 2 Initial Appearance set for 05/02/2025 09:30 AM in MDE1 before Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin.
Related: [-]