Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:25-mj-00824
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Terminated:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 2:22 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Alberto Garcia
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Carlos Ferm Bonilla-Rodriguez (1)
Terminated: 05/13/2025
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Rikin Shah
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 2:54 AM CDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
Arrest of Carlos Ferm Bonilla-Rodriguez, filed. (kll7)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. 8:1326 INITIAL APPEARANCE and PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION on Criminal Complaint as to Carlos Ferm Bonilla-Rodriguez held on 4/18/2025. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Deft, through counsel, waived Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Court found Probable Cause. Deft held without bond. Due Process Protections Act admonishments provided to Counsel by Court. Appearances: Benjamin Lyles, AUSA; Brian Buehler, AFPD. (PTS: Daniel Canchola) (ERO: Ricardo Rodriguez) (Interpreter: Maria E. Barrett and Nathan Rhodes/used) (DUSM: Lorenzo Billescas) Deft remanded to custody. (nc7)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rikin Shah, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Carlos Ferm Bonilla-Rodriguez, filed. (Shah, Rikin)
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Jose Alberto Garcia appearing for USA, filed. (Garcia, Jose)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Carlos Ferm Bonilla-Rodriguez (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 4/18/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (kll7) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/18/2025) (ced7).
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Carlos Ferm Bonilla-Rodriguez, filed. (kll7)
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Carlos Ferm Bonilla-Rodriguez, filed.
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Carlos Ferm Bonilla-Rodriguez (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Carlos Ferm Bonilla-Rodriguez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7)
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Carlos Ferm Bonilla-Rodriguez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7)
Related: [-]