Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00301
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Terminated:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 2:23 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Zachary Hunter Blackmon
Doj-Usao
contact info
Asst United States Attorney Br-Mag Duty
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Javier Esquivel-Rios (1)
Terminated: 04/29/2025
Represented By
Angel Omar Olivo-Garcia
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Brownsville
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 2:56 AM CDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 4/18/2025 as to Javier Esquivel-Rios. Defendant sworn in. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. COUNSEL DETERMINATION HEARING held. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. The defendant testifies to the Court that he cannot afford to hire his own counsel, and the Court finds the defendant qualifies for the appoint of counsel. The Court appoints counsel to represent the defendant. In the event the defendant is able to hire private counsel, deft shall reimburse appointed counsel for costs incurred up to such time that new counsel enters his/her appearance. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 04/23/2025 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. DETENTION HEARING held. Bond set at $25,000 Cash Deposit with the following conditions: Defendant shall first execute an immigration bond and secondly provide sufficient verifiable information demonstrating significant ties to the community, as ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Joe Arreola, AUSA; Nathan Janis f/deft, AFPD; (USPO: C Senteno)(ERO: E Garcia) (Interpreter: M Hanson) (DUSM: M Arellano) (CSO: E Escobedo) (als1)(9:29-9:59AM)
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Zachary Hunter Blackmon appearing for USA, filed. (Blackmon, Zachary)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Javier Esquivel-Rios (1), filed. (Cameron) (hms1) (dlr1).
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Javier Esquivel-Rios arrested on 4/16/2025, filed. (hms1) (dlr1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/18/2025) Unredacted attachment
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Federal Public Defender - Brownsville for Javier Esquivel-Rios ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1)
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Javier Esquivel-Rios ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Javier Esquivel-Rios, filed. (Olivo-Garcia, Angel)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Demand for Return of Currency by Javier Esquivel-Rios, filed. (Olivo-Garcia, Angel)
Related: [-]