Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01410
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Terminated:May 14, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 2:22 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matt Ian Kass
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cristian Jesus Gonzales-Dubon (1)
Terminated: 05/14/2025
Represented By
David N. Thomas
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 2:55 AM CDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
Arrest of Cristian Jesus Gonzales-Dubon (drda)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Cristian Jesus Gonzales-Dubon. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Cristian Jesus Gonzales-Dubon. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Cristian Jesus Gonzales-Dubon. (drda)
Related: [-]