Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01414
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Terminated:May 14, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 2:23 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Warsame Ali Khalif Galaydh
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Alejandro Perez-Gallegos (1)
Terminated: 05/14/2025
Represented By
Angela Saad Lindsey
The Lindsey Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 2:57 AM CDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
Arrest of Alejandro Perez-Gallegos (drda)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Alejandro Perez-Gallegos. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Alejandro Perez-Gallegos. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Alejandro Perez-Gallegos. (drda)
Related: [-]