California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00228
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 12:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Marco Antonio Martinez (1)
Represented By
Samantha B Jaffe
Northern District Of California Federal Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael Joseph Gonzales Lagrama
U.S. Attorneys Office Northern District Of California
contact info

GPO Mar 20 2025
STIPULATION AND ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act and Waiver Under FRCP 5.1 as to Marco Antonio Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/20/2025. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2025)
GPO Mar 21 2025
DETENTION ORDER as to Marco Antonio Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/21/2025. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 12:20 AM PDT
Monday, October 04, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Marco Martinez (1). (lskS, COURT STAFF) (lskS, COURT STAFF). [3:21-mj-71556-MAG *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion and ORDER as to Marco Martinez. Clerk of Court shall provide copies of the sealed documents to employees of the United States Attorneys Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 10/4/2021. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (lskS, COURT STAFF). [3:21-mj-71556-MAG *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
3 3 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel. Kaitlin Paulson appears in substitution of Mohit Gourisaria for the USA (mjj2, COURT STAFF) [3:21-mj-71556-MAG *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Marco Martinez (1) count(s) 1, 2. (mjj2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
3 3 MOTION for Sealing Order by USA as to Marco Martinez. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/26/2023 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal as to Marco Martinez (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse on 7/25/2023. (mjj2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]