Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Case #: 1:25-cv-22270
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Fraud
Case Filed:May 17, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 1:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Inc.
Defendant
Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, Inc.
Defendant
Blue Cross and Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.
Defendant
Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By
Ardith M. Bronson
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Defendant
Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.
Defendant
Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Inc.
Defendant
BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc.
Defendant
Canassistance, Inc.
Defendant
Florida Health Care Plan, Inc.
Defendant
Health Options, Inc.
Represented By
Ardith M. Bronson
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Defendant
Quebec Blue Cross
Plaintiff
Benjamin J. Cousins, M.D., P.A.


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
5 5 misc Status Report Wed 05/21 5:12 PM
STATUS REPORT on Removal re: 3 Order Requiring Removal Status Report by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc.(Bronson, Ardith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Docket Sheet
4 4 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/21 4:46 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Options, Inc. (Bronson, Ardith)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
3 3 order Status Report Order Tue 05/20 9:38 AM
ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report due by 6/2/2025. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/19/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 17, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 05/19 10:13 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Sat 05/17 10:14 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Third Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18458335, filed by Health Options, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc..(Bronson, Ardith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket and Filings,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Juanisha Jones in Support of Notice of Removal (with Exhibits A and B),
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet