Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:25-cv-22272
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 18, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 1:04 AM EDT
Defendant
1199SEIU Training and Employment Funds
1321 NW 14th Street Suite 400A
Miami, FL 33126
Defendant
Service Employees International Union
1321 N.W. 14th Street Suite 400A
Miami, FL 33126
Defendant
United Healthcare Workers East
1321 NW 14th Street Suite 400A
Miami, FL 33155
Plaintiff
Ana M Cruz-Ledon
2139 SW 58 Court Coral Gables
Miami, FL 33155
Represented By
Maria del Carmen Calzon
Maria Del Carmen Calzon
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 05/21 4:51 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Wed 05/21 10:28 AM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 05/19 9:36 AM
Summons Issued as to 1199SEIU Training and Employment Funds, Service Employees International Union, United Healthcare Workers East. (blc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 18, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 05/19 9:21 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (blc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 05/18 10:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18458528, filed by Ana M Cruz-Ledon.(Calzon, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s),
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet