Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-mb-05048
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 12:16 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Search Warrant (1)
Terminated: 02/20/2025


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 12:25 AM MST

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.