Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00080
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 3:14 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Peter K. Glenn-Applegate
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Alberto Jose Rios (1)
Terminated: 04/24/2025


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 3:19 AM EDT
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Alberto Rios (1). (jr)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Alberto Rios. (jr)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Alberto Rios (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/18/25. (jr)
Related: [-]