Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:25-cv-00552
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 19, 2025
Terminated:May 22, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 11:08 AM CDT
Defendant
MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC
211 E 7th Street Suite 620
Austin, TX 78701
Defendant
Micron Semiconductor Products Inc
805 Central Expressway South Suite 100
Allen, TX 75013
Defendant
Micron Technology, Inc.
805 Central Expressway South Suite 100
Allen, TX 75013
Plaintiff
Netlist, Inc.
111 Academy Drive Suite 100
Irvine, CA 92617
Represented By
Samuel Franklin Baxter
Mckool Smith, P.C. - Marshall
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 05/22 3:25 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/22/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
2 2 motion Dismiss Tue 05/20 5:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Netlist, Inc..(Baxter, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 19, 2025
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/19 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Micron Technology, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10846463.), filed by Netlist, Inc..(Baxter, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/19 3:12 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 05/19 3:12 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]