California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:25-cv-04474
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 19, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Los Angele, 25SMCV01079
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 1:04 PM PDT
Defendant
Does 1 to 20
Defendant
United States Postal Service
Defendant
Oliver Horace Williams
Plaintiff
Jesus David Orozco


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 05/22 4:22 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States of America answer now due 6/26/2025, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant United States of America.(Shin, Soo-Young)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
8 8 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 05/21 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United States of America, (Shin, Soo-Young)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/21 3:03 PM
Notice of Substitution filed by Defendant United States of America.(Shin, Soo-Young)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 05/21 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 05/20 2:45 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 05/20 2:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 05/20 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 05/19 1:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Unknown United States of America. (Shin, Soo-Young)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 05/19 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 25SMCV01079 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Nonparty United States of America. (Attorney Soo-Young Shin added to party United States of America(pty:unk))(Shin, Soo-Young)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 05/20 3:10 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 20, United States Postal Service, United States of America, Oliver Horace Williams., filed by plaintiff Jesus David Orozco. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/3/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1-1) (ghap)
Related: [-]