Billy Joe Tubbs v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-03292 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Respirator Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Company Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Corp Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
12321 Hatcherville Road
Baytown, TX 77521 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
196122 E County Road 40
Woodward, OK 73801 |
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Billy Joe Tubbs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, May 19, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 05/19 2:35 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(Associated as of 4/18/2025), Billy Joe Tubbs v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-03292-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western District of Missouri (moor) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (moor) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12399121.), filed by Billy Joe Tubbs. Service due by 7/17/2025(moor) |