New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00796
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2025
Terminated:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 1:30 AM MDT
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Rubisela Sedillo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jackson Kemper Dering
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Arturo Perez-Chacon (1)
Terminated: 05/07/2025
Represented By
David Benatar
Federal Public Defender District Of New Mexico
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 2:15 AM MDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
Arrest of Arturo Perez-Chacon (cfa)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
Hearing as to Arturo Perez-Chacon: Initial Appearance set for 4/21/2025 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (cfa)
Related: [-]