Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:25-mj-00855
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2025
Terminated:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 2:19 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Miroslava Alexis Garcia
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jose Roberto Cuadra-Parada (1)
Terminated: 05/13/2025
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Rikin Shah
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 2:44 AM CDT
Saturday, April 19, 2025
Arrest of Jose Roberto Cuadra-Parada, filed. (egg7)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Roberto Cuadra-Parada (1), filed. (Starr) Initial Appearance set for 4/21/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (kll7) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/21/2025) (ced7).
Related: [-]