Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Franklin U Valderrama
Case #: 1:25-cv-05587
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause02:431 Fed. Election Commission: Failure Enforce Compliance
Case Filed:May 20, 2025
Case in other court:Colorado, 1:25-cv-01196
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 8:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Terence M Ridley
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Defendant
Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By
Terence M Ridley
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Defendant
Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
Represented By
Terence M Ridley
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Frederick L Allman
on his own behalf and on behalf of all similarly situated persons 191 University Blvd
Denver, CO 80206
Represented By
Eric Brandon Ballou
Frickey Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 8:20 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10279024)Attorney Eric Brandon Ballou added to party Frederick L Allman(pty:pla), filed by Frederick L Allman.(Ballou, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Allstate Fire and Casualty Ins,
Att: 3 Summons Allstate Indemnity Co,
Att: 4 Summons Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Co
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (echa, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frederick L Allman. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company served on 4/18/2025, answer due 5/9/2025; Allstate Indemnity Company served on 4/18/2025, answer due 5/9/2025; Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company served on 4/18/2025, answer due 5/9/2025.(Ballou, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Allstate Indemnity,
Att: 2 Affidavit Allstate Northbrook
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, by Defendants Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Ridley, Terence) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 ORDER GRANTING Defendants'6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 05/07/2025. Defendants' Answer is due no later than June 9, 2025 . Text Only Entry(sjeff)[Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
8 8 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois by Defendants Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Ridley, Terence) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
9 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 5/15/2025. Defendants filed an8 Unopposed Motion to Transfer, however, the parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. Under the circumstances, the Clerk's Office is requested to reassign this case to a United States District Judge. Text Only Entry (sbplc4) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
10 10 CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to 9 Order. Case randomly reassigned to Judge S. Kato Crews and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. All parties do not consent. All future pleadings should be designated as 25-cv-01196-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (ccuen, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
11 11 ORDER re8 Motion to Transfer Case. Having reviewed the Motion, and in light of its unopposed nature, the Court GRANTS the request to transfer. The Clerk of Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. SO ORDERED by Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/16/2025. Text Only Entry (skclc1) [Transferred from Colorado on 5/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
12 12 RECEIVED from Colorado; Case Number 1:25-cv-01196 (nsf,)
Related: [-]