Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Referred: James Boone Baxter
Case #: 5:25-cv-00061
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 20, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 20, 2025 3:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Sportsclips Haircuts
Plaintiff
Blaek Betts
66 Private Road 13987
Hooks, TX 75561


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 05/21 3:31 PM
ORDER granting in part2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Blaek Betts. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall pay the Clerk of the Court, within twenty (20) days of the date of receipt of this Order, a partial filing fee of $84.00. (Motion(s)2 terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter on 5/21/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/20 2:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Blaek Betts. (psm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/20 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Sportsclips Haircuts, filed by Blaek Betts.(psm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EEOC Right to Sue
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Tue 05/20 2:31 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (psm)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/20 2:34 PM
STANDING ORDER REFERRING PRO SE CASES to Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/20/2025. (psm)
Related: [-]