California Eastern District Court
Judge:Christopher D Baker
Case #: 1:25-cv-00595
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:402 Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:May 20, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
7 7 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 05/21 12:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Document(s) Served Electronically Wed 05/21 11:51 AM
DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY:1 Social Security Complaint,3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis,4 Summons,5 Social Security New Case Documents served on Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to E-Service Agreement. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider Wed 05/21 11:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 8/22/2025. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re Consent,
Att: 2 Consent Form
4 4 service Summons Wed 05/21 11:47 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena and Bromberg, PC* *3467 W. Shaw Ave., Suite 100* *Fresno, CA 93711*. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/21 11:45 AM
ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP and directing Clerk of the Court to issue Summons, Scheduling Order, and Consent or Request for Reassignment Documents2 signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 5/21/2025. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/20 2:58 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Darrin John Corbin.(Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint (Social Security Appeal) Tue 05/20 2:58 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Darrin John Corbin.(Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc IFP Application Tue 05/20 4:00 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Deputy Clerk EF)
Related: [-]