District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-01512
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 21, 2025 11:05 PM EDT
Petitioner
MICHAEL LARUSSO
Reg. No. 1971294 PINELLAS COUNTY JAIL 14400 49th St N
Clearwater, FL 33762
Respondent
BOB GUALTIERI


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT CIVIL CASE: Initiating pleading received without a filing fee or application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs. It is directed that, within 30 days from the entry date of this notice, plaintiff shall submit to the Clerk either the $5 filing fee applicable to a civil action (check made out to Clerk, U.S. District Court) or a completed and signed application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs (https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/AO240woPrepaymentCosts.pdf.) Failure to do so will result in this case being administratively closed. It is further directed that any payment or motion must include the assigned case number: 25cv1512 UNA. So ordered by the Clerk of Court. Pro se filer notified by first class mail. Fee or IFP due by 6/19/2025. (zcpa) Modified fee amount on 5/21/2025 (znmw).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
1 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against BOB GUALTIERI filed by MICHAEL LARUSSO.(zcpa) Modified event title on 5/21/2025 (znmw).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Return Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope