Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 2:25-cv-14164
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 21, 2025
Case in other court:Nineteenth Judicial Circuit, 56-02025-CA000819-AXXXHC
Last checked: Wednesday May 21, 2025 2:13 PM EDT
Defendant
WALTON ACQUISITIONS FL, LLC
8800 N. Gainey Center Dr.
Scottsdale, AZ 85258
Represented By
Mark Frederick Bideau
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Plaintiff
SUNRISE RESIDENTIAL, LLC
200 E Robinson Street, #1120
Orlando, FL 32801
Represented By
Joseph Charles Shoemaker
Bogin, Munns, And Munns P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
3 3 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/22 1:15 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES IN REMOVAL CASES. ( Removal Status Report due by 6/23/2025.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/22/2025. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 05/21 2:09 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Wed 05/21 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) No answer/motion to dismiss filed. Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18467931, filed by WALTON ACQUISITIONS FL, LLC.(Bideau, Mark) Modified text on 5/21/2025 (gqa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Docket and Filings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet